Study guides

Q: 1x1x1 plus 2x2x2 plus 4x4x4 plus 5x5x5 equals?

Write your answer...

Submit

Related questions

1x1x1 = 1... 2x2x2 = 8... 3x3x3 = 27... 4x4x4 = 64... 5x5x5 = 125

All I can think of are the 2x2x2, 3x3x3, 4x4x4, 5x5x5, 6x6x6, 7x7x7, there might be a 8x8x8, Pyraminx, Megaminx, Octahedron, Teraminx, and the 1x1x1 :)

28 is the non-cubic number The others work out like this - 2x2x2=8 4x4x4=64 5x5x5=125

The first 5 cubed numbers are 1x1x1=1, 2x2x2=8, 3x3x3=27, 4x4x4=64 and 5x5x5=125. :)

Cubing a number is easier, take the number 2, to square it, you do 2x2, but when you want to cube 2, you do 2x2x2 to get 81x1x1 = 12x2x2 = 83x3x3 = 274x4x4 = 645x5x5 = 1256x6x6 = 216

1 cubed = 13 = 1x1x1 = 1 2 cubed = 23 = 2x2x2 = 8 3 cubed = 33 = 3x3x3 = 27 4 cubed = 43 = 4x4x4 = 64 5 cubed = 53 = 5x5x5 = 125

On a...2x2x2: 243x3x3: 544x4x4: 965x5x5: 150

Cubes of digits 1 - 4n3. (nxnxn) 13 = 1, 23 = 8, 33 = 27...1x1x1 = 12x2x2 = 83x3x3 = 274x4x4 = 645x5x5 = 1256x6x6 = 216

No. 64 is a cube number (4x4x4), 125 is the next one (5x5x5).

2x2x2 (Mini Cube)3x3x3 (The Classic)4x4x4 (Rubik's Revenge)5x5x5 (The Professor Cube)Rubik's MagicRubik's Twist Cube

squaring a number is when you times it by itself. eg. 2x2 or 5x5 cubing a number is when you times it by itself and then times it again. eg. 2x2x2 or 5x5x5

5x5x5 equals 125 so that 3 fives used 125-5 equals 120 that's 4 used then 120/5 equals 24 that's 5 Done Easy as that Here's the equation ((5x5x5)-5)/5

It equals 125 5x5x5=125

5x5x5=535x5x5=125

5x5x5 5x5x5 5x5x5 5x5x5

1x1x1=1 2x2x2=8 3x3x3=27 4x4x4=64 5x5x5=125 6x6x6=216 7x7x7=343 8x8x8=512 9x9x9=729 10x10x10=1000 11x11x11=1331 12x12x12=1728 13x13x13=2197 14x14x14=2744 15x15x15=3375 16x16x16=4096 17x17x17=4913 18x18x18=5832 19x19x19=6859 20x20x20=8000 21x21x21=9261 use calculator to work out the rest cant be bothered to write out any more LOL :-)

21 Interesting figure, how it was reached I have no idea. However, not including the other products (like the Rubik's magic, and there are lots more) Rubik's or similar companies manufacture - just the Rubik's cube, not including variations on the regular cubes like the Sudokube or special patterned ones, there are four. These include the 2x2x2, the 3x3x3, the 4x4x4 Rubik's, and the 5x5x5. There are 6x6x6 and 7x7x7 cubes in existence, but are technically not Rubik''s cubes because they are manufactured by different companies (Eastsheen, and V-Cube - who are developing cube sizes up to 11x11x11!! (can't wait for that)).

If you want more detailed answer, 2x2x2 = 8 3x3 = 9 5x5x5 = 125 8x9x125 = 9,000 of course there are many different ways to answer, this is just a basic way.

5x5x5 can be simplified to 53 or 'five cubed.' This would equal 125.

125 5x5x5 5x5x5 would that be what your looking for

A cube that equals 125 is 5x5x5. It has six sides that are 5x5 25x6=150 square units.

5 to the third power means 5 x 5 x 5(five times five times five). The answer to five to the power of three (also 5x5x5) equals 53 which equals 625.

15,625

5x5x5. (:

125